NY S09032 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of the state highway system in Erie county as the "SGT Brian K. Baker Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of the state highway system in Erie county as the "SGT Brian K. Baker Memorial Bridge".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.421
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10877a
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1907
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10877 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9032

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback