NY A10877 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9032
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9032
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Erie county as the "SGT Brian K. Baker Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Erie county as the "SGT Brian K. Baker Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s9032 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.421 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.421 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | print number 10877a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S09032 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.287