NY S08956 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.781
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.781
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Syracuse regional airport authority; requires the authority to only give notice to the city of Syracuse before beginning certain projects exceeding ten million dollars.
Title
Relates to the Syracuse regional airport authority; requires the authority to only give notice to the city of Syracuse before beginning certain projects exceeding ten million dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.781 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.429 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a9966c |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1692 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8956C |
2022-05-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8956B |
2022-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8956A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09966 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8956c