CA AB3240 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 70047 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 70048 of, the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
California Ban on Scholarship Displacement Act of 2021: Cal Grant awards.
Sponsors
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Assembly - AB 3240 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3240 Calderon et al. By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 3240 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3240 Calderon et al. By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 3240 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 851, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70047 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70048 | New Code | See Bill Text |