NY A09966 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8956c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8956c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Syracuse regional airport authority; requires the authority to only give notice to the city of Syracuse before beginning certain projects exceeding ten million dollars.
Title
Relates to the Syracuse regional airport authority; requires the authority to only give notice to the city of Syracuse before beginning certain projects exceeding ten million dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s8956c |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9966c |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.429 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.429 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | print number 9966b |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 9966a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08956 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.781