CA AB869 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130065 of, and to add Sections 130065.1, 130065.15, 130078.5, and 130078.6 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospitals.
Title
Hospitals: seismic safety compliance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Assembly - AB 869 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB869 Wood et al. By Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 869 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB869 Wood et al. By Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 869 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1879.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 130065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130065.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130065.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130078.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130078.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |