NY S08722 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state chartered banking institutions from investing in and providing financing for private prisons.
Title
Prohibits state chartered banking institutions from investing in and providing financing for private prisons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.949 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO BANKS |
2020-07-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07580 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.287