NY S08700 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Continues NYS Smart Scholars early college high school program and the NYS pathways in technology early college high school program.
Title
Continues NYS Smart Scholars early college high school program and the NYS pathways in technology early college high school program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 8706A |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1467 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10467 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - referred to education
A11047 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - print number 11047a
A11047 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - print number 11047a