NY S08609 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes peer recovery advocate telehealth services for reimbursement.
Title
Authorizes peer recovery advocate telehealth services for reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1023 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8609A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10665 (Same As) 2020-07-14 - print number 10665a