NY S08545 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Liverpool central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Permits the Liverpool central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.919 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10789 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - referred to education