NY S08402 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "go green schools act" to assist school districts in converting to renewable energy sources as a primary source of energy; directs NYSERDA to conduct a study and make recommendations for such purpose.
Title
Enacts the "go green schools act" to assist school districts in converting to renewable energy sources as a primary source of energy; directs NYSERDA to conduct a study and make recommendations for such purpose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2024-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 8402A |
2024-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.445 |
2024-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10611 (Same As) 2024-06-20 - referred to energy