NY S08369 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "freelance isn't free act"; provides for the payment of freelance workers as independent contractors, including requiring written contracts; timely payment of compensation and handling controversies relating to payment, complaint procedures, and penalties; excludes construction contracts.
Title
Enacts the "freelance isn't free act"; provides for the payment of freelance workers as independent contractors, including requiring written contracts; timely payment of compensation and handling controversies relating to payment, complaint procedures, and penalties; excludes construction contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.170 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.617 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9368a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1775 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8369B |
2022-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8369A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09368 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8369b