NY A09368 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8369b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8369b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "freelance isn't free act"; provides for the payment of freelance workers as independent contractors, including requiring written contracts; timely payment of compensation and handling controversies relating to payment, complaint procedures, and penalties; excludes construction contracts.
Title
Enacts the "freelance isn't free act"; provides for the payment of freelance workers as independent contractors, including requiring written contracts; timely payment of compensation and handling controversies relating to payment, complaint procedures, and penalties; excludes construction contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s8369b |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.617 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-29 | Assembly | print number 9368a |
2022-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08369 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.170