NY S08188 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority conduct a study on Brooklyn College constructing a micro-grid to study the feasibility, efficiency, and energy saving costs if such a micro-grid was constructed on campus.
Title
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority conduct a study on Brooklyn College constructing a micro-grid to study the feasibility, efficiency, and energy saving costs if such a micro-grid was constructed on campus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2024-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.221 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09022 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - referred to energy