NY S08161 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of New Windsor in Orange county to impose a five percent hotel and motel tax.
Title
Authorizes the town of New Windsor in Orange county to impose a five percent hotel and motel tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8860 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1415 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08860 (Same As) 2024-08-20 - delivered to governor