NY S07930 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the use of the term "incorrigible".
Title
Eliminates the use of the term "incorrigible".
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.836 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10141 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - referred to children and families