NY S07796 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of a "disguised gun" to include any firearms designed and intended to appear to be a toy gun.
Title
Amends the definition of a "disguised gun" to include any firearms designed and intended to appear to be a toy gun.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.112 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.24 |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | substituted for a8736 |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-01-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.162 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08736 (Same As) 2022-02-01 - substituted by s7796