NY A08736 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - substituted by s7796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - substituted by s7796
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of a "disguised gun" to include any firearms designed and intended to appear to be a toy gun.
Title
Amends the definition of a "disguised gun" to include any firearms designed and intended to appear to be a toy gun.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | substituted by s7796 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.24 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.24 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07796 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.112