NY S07795 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to the transfer of incarcerated individuals from a county jail to a state correctional institution.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to the transfer of incarcerated individuals from a county jail to a state correctional institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-12-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10126 (Same As) 2024-05-06 - referred to correction