NY S07487 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 7487C
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 7487C
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to false or misleading advertisements of food and food products; provides factors to determine whether an advertisement is false or misleading; provides for enforcement and a private right of action.
Title
Relates to false or misleading advertisements of food and food products; provides factors to determine whether an advertisement is false or misleading; provides for enforcement and a private right of action.
Sponsors
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7487C |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2022-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7487B |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7487A |
2022-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-10-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08583 (Same As) 2022-08-03 - print number 8583c