NY S07345 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 7345A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 7345A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides support to refugees from Afghanistan and Ukraine who have been displaced through no fault of their own.
Title
Provides support to refugees from Afghanistan and Ukraine who have been displaced through no fault of their own.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7345A |
2022-04-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-08-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08374 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - print number 8374a