NY S07314 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a definition for the terms veteran and armed forces; amends the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Provides a definition for the terms veteran and armed forces; amends the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.35 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.647 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted for a8927 |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-01-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.42 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08927 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7314