NY S07263 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-18 - SIGNED CHAP.579
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-18 - SIGNED CHAP.579
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers to provide an insurer or subscriber who is a victim of domestic violence, upon request of such insurer or subscriber, with the option to designate alternative contact information for the purpose of receiving specific claim information or for specific billing purposes.
Title
Requires health insurers to provide an insurer or subscriber who is a victim of domestic violence, upon request of such insurer or subscriber, with the option to designate alternative contact information for the purpose of receiving specific claim information or for specific billing purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.579 |
2022-10-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.107 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | substituted for a2519a |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7263A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1086 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-06-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02519 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - substituted by s7263a