NY A02519 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - substituted by s7263a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - substituted by s7263a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers to provide an insurer or subscriber who is a victim of domestic violence, upon request of such insurer or subscriber, with the option to designate alternative contact information for the purpose of receiving specific claim information or for specific billing purposes.
Title
Requires health insurers to provide an insurer or subscriber who is a victim of domestic violence, upon request of such insurer or subscriber, with the option to designate alternative contact information for the purpose of receiving specific claim information or for specific billing purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | substituted by s7263a |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2519a |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.107 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.295 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07263 (Same As) 2022-10-18 - SIGNED CHAP.579