NY S07028 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to price gouging; imposes criminal penalties for price gouging; removes language relating to the declaration of a state of emergency; increases civil penalty; authorizes a district attorney to enforce provisions.
Title
Relates to price gouging; imposes criminal penalties for price gouging; removes language relating to the declaration of a state of emergency; increases civil penalty; authorizes a district attorney to enforce provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
S02034 (Same As) 2017-01-11 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
A05249 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.373
A05249 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.373