NY S06964 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-23 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-23 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that local governments comply with a detainer request issued by a federal law enforcement agency; requires that such local government not interfere with the ability of federal law enforcement officials to conduct enforcement activities at municipal or county jails in furtherance of their duty to enforce federal laws.
Title
Requires that local governments comply with a detainer request issued by a federal law enforcement agency; requires that such local government not interfere with the ability of federal law enforcement officials to conduct enforcement activities at municipal or county jails in furtherance of their duty to enforce federal laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07706 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - held for consideration in local governments