NY S06869 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the existence of the Hamilton county industrial development agency until July 21, 2026, regardless of whether it has any outstanding obligations.
Title
Extends the existence of the Hamilton county industrial development agency until July 21, 2026, regardless of whether it has any outstanding obligations.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.87 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a9407 |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-04-05 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.402 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09407 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s6869