NY S06834 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.321
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.321
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain findings and determinations with respect to bond anticipation notes issued by the village of Webster and legalizes and authorizes the issuance of obligations of such notes.
Title
Validates certain findings and determinations with respect to bond anticipation notes issued by the village of Webster and legalizes and authorizes the issuance of obligations of such notes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.321 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.311 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9735a |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-06 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.909 |
2012-04-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6834A |
2012-04-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09735 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s6834a