NY S06561 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the adoption of a local law requiring certain individuals currently serving or who shall be sentenced to a period of probation upon conviction of any crime to pay the local probation department with the responsibility of supervising the probationer an administrative fee of up to twenty dollars per month.
Title
Authorizes the adoption of a local law requiring certain individuals currently serving or who shall be sentenced to a period of probation upon conviction of any crime to pay the local probation department with the responsibility of supervising the probationer an administrative fee of up to twenty dollars per month.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Owen Johnson [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.807 |
2012-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08669 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to governmental operations