NY S06428 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - SIGNED CHAP.10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - SIGNED CHAP.10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring pet dealers to provide instructions pertaining to the care of small animals.
Title
Relates to requiring pet dealers to provide instructions pertaining to the care of small animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.10 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.387 |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9204 |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-25 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-02-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6428A |
2016-02-08 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-01-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.39 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09204 (Same As) 2016-03-02 - substituted by s6428a