NY A09204 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - substituted by s6428a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - substituted by s6428a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring pet dealers to provide instructions pertaining to the care of small animals.
Title
Relates to requiring pet dealers to provide instructions pertaining to the care of small animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Assembly | substituted by s6428a |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.387 |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06428 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - SIGNED CHAP.10