NY S06214 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adjournments in contemplation of dismissal and suspended judgments in child protective proceedings in the family court.
Title
Relates to adjournments in contemplation of dismissal and suspended judgments in child protective proceedings in the family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.219 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.951 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A11022 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - referred to judiciary