NY S06138 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limitations on powers and immunities of executors and testamentary trustees.
Title
Relates to limitations on powers and immunities of executors and testamentary trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10100 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.810 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1133 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10100 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.245