NY A10100 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limitations on powers and immunities of executors and testamentary trustees.
Title
Relates to limitations on powers and immunities of executors and testamentary trustees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.245 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.810 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6138 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.726 |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06138 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10100