NY S06011 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a study by the department of corrections and community supervision pertaining to the treatment of aging prison populations.
Title
Authorizes a study by the department of corrections and community supervision pertaining to the treatment of aging prison populations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09171 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - REFERRED TO FINANCE