NY S05873 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful discriminatory practices.
Title
Relates to unlawful discriminatory practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1438 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1582 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |