IL SB0085 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Beverage Container Recycling Refunds Act. Establishes the Distributor and Importer Responsibility Organization to implement a beverage container recycling redemption refund program to issue redemption refunds to consumers for beverage containers. Provides avenues for redeeming refunds under the Act. Contains labeling requirements. Sets forth performance targets for the Organization. Contains reporting requirements. Requires the Organization to establish an Operations Advisory Committee and an Equity and Access Advisory Committee. Contains provisions concerning reimbursement, enforcement, and administration and other provisions.
Title
BEVERAGE CONTAINER REFUND
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-07-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this committee amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2023-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |