RI H7205 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE MEDICAID REENTRY ACT - Requires that Medicaid enrollment be maintained or provided to all inmates in the first 30 days of incarceration at the adult correctional institutions within the department of corrections and the last 30 days of incarceration.
Title
Requires that Medicaid enrollment be maintained or provided to all inmates in the first 30 days of incarceration at the adult correctional institutions within the department of corrections and the last 30 days of incarceration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/01/2024) |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7205.pdf |