KY HB11 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS 438.305 to 438.340 to define terms; require the Secretary of State to create and publish a list of certain tobacco product retailers; require the Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control to create and maintain a tobacco noncompliance database and reporting system; require wholesalers to verify a retailer's presence in the database prior to transactions; establish and impose fines for wholesalers that unlawfully sell to a retailer that is in the noncompliance database; make ineligible any retailer with unpaid fines that are more than 60 days overdue from selling Tobacco Control Act covered products until the fines are paid; direct manufacturers of Tobacco Control Act covered products to provide safe harbor certification to wholesalers and retailers of their products; prohibit a retailer from selling Tobacco Control Act products to persons under 21 years of age; establish; amend KRS 241.060 to allow the board to conduct hearings and appeals under this Act and KRS 438.340.
Title
AN ACT relating to nicotine products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 428 (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3194 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 255 (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3194 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 255 (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | passed 64-27 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | passed 29-7-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment (1) withdrawn |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2024-03-27 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | reassigned to Judiciary (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 62-26 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-28 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |