CO HB1164 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to provide menstrual products at no expense to students, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Free Menstrual Products to Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1164 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1164, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1164 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1164 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1164, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |