RI S2442 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES -- HIV/AIDS - Repeals the required HIV testing for an individual convicted under chapter 34.1 of title 11 and allows the option for HIV testing for any person convicted under this chapter.
Title
Repeals the required HIV testing for an individual convicted under chapter 34.1 of title 11 and allows the option for HIV testing for any person convicted under this chapter.
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Jacob Bissaillon [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2024) |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Health And Safety
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES -- HIV/AIDS
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- PREVENTION AND SUPPRESSION OF CONTAGIOUS DISEASES -- HIV/AIDS