NY S05809 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Monroe county to establish wireless surcharges.
Title
Authorizes Monroe county to establish wireless surcharges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8035 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1693 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1660 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08035 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - signed chap.259