NY S05792 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Newburgh, Orange county, to establish a road improvement district in the Ridge Hudson Valley development area.
Title
Authorizes the town of Newburgh, Orange county, to establish a road improvement district in the Ridge Hudson Valley development area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.278 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.187 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7701 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1166 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07701 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.278