NY S05627 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands customer access to community distributed generation by creating a model tariff to provide for the transfer of bill credits associated with electricity produced by community distributed generation facilities in one electric corporation territory to other territories.
Title
Expands customer access to community distributed generation by creating a model tariff to provide for the transfer of bill credits associated with electricity produced by community distributed generation facilities in one electric corporation territory to other territories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.996 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.887 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07286 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means