NY S05619 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental conservation to study alternative municipal uses for recycled glass; requires the department to submit a report containing its findings along with legislative proposals as it deems necessary to implement its recommendations.
Title
Directs the department of environmental conservation to study alternative municipal uses for recycled glass; requires the department to submit a report containing its findings along with legislative proposals as it deems necessary to implement its recommendations.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.346 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1162 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |