NY S05593 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the detention of individuals in a county jail pending a first court appearance in an off-hours arraignment part.
Title
Permits the detention of individuals in a county jail pending a first court appearance in an off-hours arraignment part.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | approval memo.52 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.665 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1257 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5593 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.563 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-14 | Senate | referred to correction |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7647 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1257 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07647 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - approval memo.52