NY A07647 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits the detention of individuals in a county jail pending a first court appearance in an off-hours arraignment part.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits the detention of individuals in a county jail pending a first court appearance in an off-hours arraignment part.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.1257
2019-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5593
2019-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.563
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-14Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S05593 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7647

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07647&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07647&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07647
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07647&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07647&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07647&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7647#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback