NY S05508 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7222B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7222B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for clerk-treasurer or deputy clerk-treasurer in the village of Fair Haven; allows the clerk-treasurer or deputy clerk to reside in the county in which such town is located or an adjoining county within the state of New York.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for clerk-treasurer or deputy clerk-treasurer in the village of Fair Haven; allows the clerk-treasurer or deputy clerk to reside in the county in which such town is located or an adjoining county within the state of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7222B |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1644 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5508B |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5508A |
2017-04-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07222 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.191