NY S05473 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7737B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7737B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rights of parties involved in foreclosure actions; provides additional details regarding the commencement and termination of certain actions related to real property.
Title
Relates to the rights of parties involved in foreclosure actions; provides additional details regarding the commencement and termination of certain actions related to real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7737B |
2022-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.704 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5473D |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5473C |
2021-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2021-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5473B |
2021-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5473A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |