NY A07737 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the rights of parties involved in foreclosure actions; provides additional details regarding the commencement and termination of certain actions related to real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the rights of parties involved in foreclosure actions; provides additional details regarding the commencement and termination of certain actions related to real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-05-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-05-03Senate3RD READING CAL.704
2022-05-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5473D
2022-03-23SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2022-03-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2022-03-23Assemblypassed assembly
2022-02-14Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 7737b
2022-01-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.274
2021-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.511
2021-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.511
2021-06-07Assemblyreported
2021-05-26Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 7737a
2021-05-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-20Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S07293 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
S05473 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7737B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7737
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07737&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07737
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07737&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07737A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07737&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07737B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07737&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07737&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07737&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7737#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback